LA HB659 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to fire protection districts in Lafourche Parish
Title
Provides relative to fire protection districts in Lafourche Parish
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House. | |
2010-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 11, 2010. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-04 | Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-04-19 | Read by title. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |