LA HB639 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Effective date: 06/30/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to infrastructure funding (EN -$400,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to infrastructure funding (EN -$400,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 639 ADOPT (#1140) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 639 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1255) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 639 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1137) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 639 FINAL PASSAGE (#958) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 639 FINAL PASSAGE (#357) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22HouseEffective date: 06/30/2021.
2021-06-22HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 448.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-10HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-10SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2021-06-10HouseRules suspended.
2021-06-10HouseConference Committee report received.
2021-06-09HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-09SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: White, Henry, and Peterson.
2021-06-09SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Zeringue, Magee, and Schexnayder.
2021-06-08SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2021-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-07SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2021-06-07SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-01SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2021-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-11HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably (19-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB639&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212340
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219804
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223544
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234693
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235960
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220243
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222313
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231450
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232651
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232921
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212367
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215467
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220207
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221860
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223735
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229899
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230808
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233120
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234616
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235062
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223448
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232928
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233510
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234633
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234655

Bill Comments 750

feedback