LA HB638 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the qualifications and fees for the Fraternal Order of Police license plate (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Changes the qualifications and fees for the Fraternal Order of Police license plate (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 638, FINAL PASSAGE (#642) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 638, FINAL PASSAGE (#101) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 638, FINAL PASSAGE (#101) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 43. | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-18 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-17 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-05-17 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-12 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-10 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-12 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-04-12 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 12, 2010. | |
2010-04-06 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-05 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-16 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled. |