LA HB636 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of zip codes as the sole basis for rate determinations
Title
Prohibits the use of zip codes as the sole basis for rate determinations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - House Vote on HB 636 FINAL PASSAGE (#512) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/18. |
2018-04-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |