LA HB633 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for Revenue Sharing Distribution for Fiscal Year 2022-2023
Title
Provides for Revenue Sharing Distribution for Fiscal Year 2022-2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 633 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#997) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#713) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#419) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#713) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#419) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-30 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 197. |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/20/2022. |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-05-19 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2022-05-18 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/19/2022. |
2022-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-19 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 7 for 04/21/2022. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |