LA HB633 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to testing for lead in drinking water (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to testing for lead in drinking water (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#1286) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#984) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 633 MOTION TO RECONSIDER (#841) (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 633 MOTION TO RECONSIDER (#793) (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#726) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#593) (Y: 48 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#984) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 633 MOTION TO RECONSIDER (#841) (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 633 MOTION TO RECONSIDER (#793) (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#726) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#593) (Y: 48 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 632. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-11 | House | Reconsidered. |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-09 | House | Motion to suspend the rules failed. |
2018-05-08 | House | Motion to Suspend the Rules failed. |
2018-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 50, nays 46. Failed to pass. |
2018-05-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/18. |
2018-05-01 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-30 | House | Notice removed |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-27 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2018-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 40. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. |
2018-04-26 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/18. |
2018-04-23 | House | Notice given. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/18. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |