LA HB633 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to preventing the spread of disease through the unlawful transportation of diseased animals, livestock, or adulterated meat

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to preventing the spread of disease through the unlawful transportation of diseased animals, livestock, or adulterated meat

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#552) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 633 FINAL PASSAGE (#191) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-05HouseEffective date: August 1, 2013.
2013-06-05HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 115.
2013-05-30HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2013-05-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2013-05-28HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2013-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2013-05-23SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-05-16SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-05-15SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-05-14SenateReported favorably.
2013-05-06SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2013-05-01SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2013-04-30HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2013-04-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/30/2013.
2013-04-23HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
2013-04-22HouseReported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent).
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2013-04-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
2013-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2013-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback