LA HB63 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that any contractor who enters into a contract with a public entity comply with the Louisiana Equal Pay for Women Act
Title
Requires that any contractor who enters into a contract with a public entity comply with the Louisiana Equal Pay for Women Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2019-03-15 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2019. |
2019-03-13 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2019-03-13 | House | Prefiled. |