LA HB627 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 06/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the transfer of certain state property in St. Martin Parish

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the transfer of certain state property in St. Martin Parish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 627 FINAL PASSAGE (#960) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 627 FINAL PASSAGE (#173) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14HouseEffective date: 06/14/2021.
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 333.
2021-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2021-05-27SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2021-05-27SenateRules suspended.
2021-05-19SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-18SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-17SenateReported favorably.
2021-05-05SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-05-04SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB627&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212280
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216790
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220228
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233052
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235662
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1213721
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216520
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219721
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212292
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216855
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220240
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237370
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220102
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232931

Bill Comments 750

feedback