LA HB622 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-12-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-12-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the office of rural development and the Rural Development Program (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the office of rural development and the Rural Development Program (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 622 FINAL PASSAGE (#936) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 622 FINAL PASSAGE (#515) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 622 FINAL PASSAGE (#515) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2021. |
2021-06-14 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 331. |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2021-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2021-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |