LA HB614 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB388
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain information from the Public Records Law (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Exempts certain information from the Public Records Law (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 614 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#966) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 614 FINAL PASSAGE (#882) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 614 FINAL PASSAGE (#369) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 614 FINAL PASSAGE (#369) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 614 FINAL PASSAGE (#882) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 614 FINAL PASSAGE (#369) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 614 FINAL PASSAGE (#369) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2019. |
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 256. |
2019-06-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2019-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19. |
2019-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 388 reported by the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs (10-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB388 (Replaces) 2019-05-02 - Becomes HB 614.