LA HB609 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides with respect to liability for peace officers engaged in certain actions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides with respect to liability for peace officers engaged in certain actions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 609 FINAL PASSAGE (#381) (Y: 53 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 609 AMENDMENT # 2774 BY IVEY MOTION TO ADOPT (#378) (Y: 37 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 609 AMENDMENT # 2649 BY FONTENOT MOTION TO ADOPT (#377) (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 609 3/10/3 MINUTE in DEBATE RULE (#376) (Y: 14 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2021-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-11HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 42. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-11HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-11HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-03HouseReported with amendments (9-4-1).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB609&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212164
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220047
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223672
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219082
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219981
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223117
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223629
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229538
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212180
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220245
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223761
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223558
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223625
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223645
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223662

Bill Comments 750

feedback