LA HB60 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the termination or extension of a state of emergency (Item #28)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the termination or extension of a state of emergency (Item #28)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on HB 60 FINAL PASSAGE (#26) (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-05SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-10-02HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-01HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/02/20.
2020-10-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-01HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-01HouseReported with amendments (12-0-1).
2020-09-30HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=HB60&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189880
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189896
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190536
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190080
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190333
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190106
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190379
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189882
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190377
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190551
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190504

Bill Comments

feedback