LA HB60 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-18-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the effectiveness of certain sales and use tax holidays (RE -$4,900,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the effectiveness of certain sales and use tax holidays (RE -$4,900,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 60 FINAL PASSAGE (#12) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-04-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/22/19.
2019-04-16HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-15HouseReported with amendments (18-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-15HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2019.
2019-03-13HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-13HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB60&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1114940
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124598
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126050
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124446
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124047
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124655
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125627
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1114946
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124202
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124642
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125088
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126159
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126460
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126012

Bill Comments

feedback