LA HB6 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date: 07/13/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date: 07/13/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the State Cybersecurity and Information Technology Fund and dedicates revenues to the fund (Items #10 and #11) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Establishes the State Cybersecurity and Information Technology Fund and dedicates revenues to the fund (Items #10 and #11) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on HB 6 MOTION TO ADOPT (#190) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 6 ADOPT (#179) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote on HB 6 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#133) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 6 FINAL PASSAGE (#76) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 6 FINAL PASSAGE (#25) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 6 ADOPT (#179) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote on HB 6 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#133) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 6 FINAL PASSAGE (#76) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 6 FINAL PASSAGE (#25) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Effective date: 07/13/2020. |
2020-07-13 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 26. |
2020-07-01 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-30 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2020-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-06-30 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2020-06-30 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2020-06-28 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: White, Hewitt, and Ward. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2020-06-25 | House | House conferees appointed: Ivey, Zeringue, and McKnight. |
2020-06-25 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2020-06-25 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-06-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-06-23 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/24/20. |
2020-06-23 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-06-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-06-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/11/20. |
2020-06-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-06-09 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2020-06-01 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |