LA HB599 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-27-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) To provide for a property tax exemption for certain veterans with disabilities (EG DECREASE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) To provide for a property tax exemption for certain veterans with disabilities (EG DECREASE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]
Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]
Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]
Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Michael Echols [R]
Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Gabe Firment [R]Rep. Adrian Fisher [D]
Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]
Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]Rep. Kyle Green [D]
Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. John Illg [R]
Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]
Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Vanessa Caston Lafleur [D]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]
Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]
Rep. Scott McKnight [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]
Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]Rep. Richard Nelson [R]Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Joseph Orgeron [R]
Rep. Charles Owen [R]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Neil Riser [R]Rep. Troy Romero [R]
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Larry Selders [D]Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]
Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Phillip Tarver [R]Rep. Francis Thompson [D]
Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Debbie Villio [R]Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Mark Wright [R]
Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]

Roll Calls

2022-04-12 - House - House Vote on HB 599 FINAL PASSAGE (#276) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2022-05-17SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2022-05-16SenateReported favorably.
2022-04-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2022-04-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2022-04-12HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2022-04-12HouseCalled from the calendar.
2022-04-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2022.
2022-04-11HouseNotice given.
2022-04-11HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2022-04-11HouseCalled from the calendar.
2022-04-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2022.
2022-04-07HouseNotice given.
2022-04-07HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2022-04-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2022.
2022-04-04HouseRead by title, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2022-03-29HouseReported without amendments (16-0).
2022-03-23HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2022-03-22HouseReported with amendments (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2022-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2022-03-04HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
2022-03-04HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2022-03-04HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback