LA HB599 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reduces the rate of the .45% state sales and use tax levy over a certain period of time (RE -$392,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduces the rate of the .45% state sales and use tax levy over a certain period of time (RE -$392,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 599 FINAL PASSAGE (#564) (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 599 LIMIT DEBATE (#563) (Y: 61 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-05-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-21HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-20HouseReported favorably (12-5).
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably (16-0).
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB599&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125419
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133477
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137372
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134890
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137319
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137076
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125420
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130977
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133659
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133983
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137552
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138750
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137350
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137475

Bill Comments

feedback