LA HB597 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes a state and local sales and use tax exclusion for certain re-leases or re-rentals of items of tangible personal property (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes a state and local sales and use tax exclusion for certain re-leases or re-rentals of items of tangible personal property (RE DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 597 FINAL PASSAGE (#495) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2019-05-27SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-05-23SenateRules suspended.
2019-05-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB597&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125413
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133475
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136859
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134318
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125414
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130978
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133676
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133987
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136880
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137521
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136851

Bill Comments

feedback