LA HB592 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the regulations for and authority of owners or lessors of a qualified truck stop facility
Title
Provides relative to the regulations for and authority of owners or lessors of a qualified truck stop facility
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/05/18. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported with amendments (11-2-1). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |