LA HB591 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to fee exemptions for certain solar power generation facilities (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to fee exemptions for certain solar power generation facilities (EG SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 591 FINAL PASSAGE (#137) (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2023. |
2023-04-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2023-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |