LA HB590 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Efficient Government Act and provides for the Council on Efficient Government and its powers and duties (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Efficient Government Act and provides for the Council on Efficient Government and its powers and duties (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | House | Notice removed |
2018-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18. |
2018-05-10 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-10 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |