LA HB590 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to fires of suspicious origin
Title
Provides with respect to fires of suspicious origin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 590, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1592) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 590, FINAL PASSAGE (#1363) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 590, FINAL PASSAGE (#444) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 590, FINAL PASSAGE (#1363) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 590, FINAL PASSAGE (#444) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 822. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-10 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-04 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-03 | Reported with amendments. | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2010-04-29 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 28, 2010. | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-20 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-31 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported with amendments (17-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-16 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled. |