LA HB59 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to limitations of liability for public and private school districts and postsecondary institutions during a declared state of emergency or a public health emergency (Item #40)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to limitations of liability for public and private school districts and postsecondary institutions during a declared state of emergency or a public health emergency (Item #40)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 59 ADOPT (#192) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on HB 59 MOTION TO ADOPT (#193) (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on HB 59 3 MINUTE RULE (#192) (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Vote on HB 59 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#171) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 59 FINAL PASSAGE (#154) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 59 FINAL PASSAGE (#93) (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-30HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-30HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 55, nays 40. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-30HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-30HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-06-30HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-06-30SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Fields, Pope, and Mizell.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-06-29HouseHouse conferees appointed: Mincey, Bishop, and Schexnayder.
2020-06-29HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 15, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-06-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-29SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-28SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-28SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-24SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-06-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-06-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/23/20.
2020-06-22HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-18HouseReported with amendments (14-0-1).
2020-06-15HouseRead by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-06-15HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-06-10HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-06-09HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB59&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180796
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182720
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183600
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185201
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181892
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182676
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182987
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183435
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183528
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184495
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184383
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184282
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184506
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184717
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184699
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184673
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184781
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184990
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180797
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182958
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183650
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184572
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185108
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183581
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184721
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185170
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185177
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185182

Bill Comments

feedback