LA HB585 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 06/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adds structures located in opportunity zones to the property eligible to participate in the Restoration Tax Abatement program (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds structures located in opportunity zones to the property eligible to participate in the Restoration Tax Abatement program (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 585 FINAL PASSAGE (#596) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 585 FINAL PASSAGE (#515) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseEffective date: 06/11/2019.
2019-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 251.
2019-06-02HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-05-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-30HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-05-30SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-29SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-28SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-27SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-22HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-22HouseRules suspended, called out of its regular order.
2019-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-20HouseNotice given.
2019-05-20HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-07HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-06HouseReported with amendments (16-0).
2019-04-16HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-04-15HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB585&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124252
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131568
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139797
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144117
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125110
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124253
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130988
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131682
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131829
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140861
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1147243
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137089
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139573

Bill Comments 750

feedback