LA HB584 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-25 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Hearing: May 29 @ 10:00 am in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the authorized uses of funds in the Crime Victims Reparations Fund (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the authorized uses of funds in the Crime Victims Reparations Fund (RE SEE FISC NOTE SD EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 584 FINAL PASSAGE (#367) (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback