LA HB582 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Dedicates a portion of the existing tax levied on gasoline and diesel into the Construction Subfund and imposes a one-time road-use fee on electric and hybrid vehicles (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dedicates a portion of the existing tax levied on gasoline and diesel into the Construction Subfund and imposes a one-time road-use fee on electric and hybrid vehicles (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 582 FINAL PASSAGE (#664) (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2021-05-24HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 34. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
2021-05-24HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
2021-05-20HouseNotice given.
2021-05-20HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-17HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2021-05-12HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-11HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB582&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212078
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223650
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225470
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219543
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219867
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220057
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219946
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223319
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225133
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225436
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225513
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227305
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212110
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219508
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223738
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224678
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225502
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226657
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227712

Bill Comments 750

feedback