LA HB58 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Effective date: June 30, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the definition of "employee" for the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (EN NO IMPACT APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the definition of "employee" for the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (EN NO IMPACT APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 58 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#715) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 58 FINAL PASSAGE (#584) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - House Vote on HB 58 FINAL PASSAGE (#386) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-12HouseEffective date: June 30, 2013.
2013-06-12HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 236.
2013-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2013-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2013-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2013-06-02HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2013-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2013.
2013-05-28HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2013-05-23SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-05-21SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-05-20SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2013-05-14SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2013-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2013-05-13HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2013-05-13HouseCalled from the calendar.
2013-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2013.
2013-05-06HouseNotice given.
2013-04-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2013-04-24HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2013.
2013-04-23HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-04-22HouseReported favorably (11-0) (Regular).
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2013-02-22HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2013.
2013-02-22HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2013-02-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=HB58&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=826296
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838419
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839955
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840746
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=849759
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=854590
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=854162
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=857371
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=849175
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=851034
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=854104
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=826309
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840173
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=849361
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=858735
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=847243
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=850787

Bill Comments

feedback