LA HB572 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Carbon Dioxide Geologic Storage Trust Fund (EN INCREASE SD EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Carbon Dioxide Geologic Storage Trust Fund (EN INCREASE SD EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 572 FINAL PASSAGE (#870) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 572 FINAL PASSAGE (#236) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 326.
2021-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-01SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-24SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably.
2021-05-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-05HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-28HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB572&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212039
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218767
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221526
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232946
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235642
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218227
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218397
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218839
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220305
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212050
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217698
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218819
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219478
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221663
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224432
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233719
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1238640
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221342
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232462

Bill Comments

feedback