LA HB572 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the special college and university license plates (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the special college and university license plates (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 572 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1238) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 572 FINAL PASSAGE (#1158) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Vote on HB 572 FINAL PASSAGE (#97) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 572 FINAL PASSAGE (#1158) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Vote on HB 572 FINAL PASSAGE (#97) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 660. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. |
2016-06-01 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-03-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-30 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-03-30 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/30/2016. |
2016-03-23 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |