LA HB564 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported without action, (12-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the regulation of cannabis (OR INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the regulation of cannabis (OR INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseReported without action, (12-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-05-09HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-05-09HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-09HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-08HouseReported without action, (11-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback