LA HB561 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-19 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a Lafitte Greenway Economic Development District
Title
Provides for a Lafitte Greenway Economic Development District
Sponsors
Rep. Alonzo Knox [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 561 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1694) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 561 FINAL PASSAGE (#1365) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 561 FINAL PASSAGE (#735) (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 561 FINAL PASSAGE (#1365) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 561 FINAL PASSAGE (#735) (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-19 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 708. |
2024-06-04 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-31 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 5, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-30 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2024. |
2024-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |