LA HB561 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain post employment restraints on the practice of medicine on physicians employed by the state (EG SEE FISC NOTE OF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits certain post employment restraints on the practice of medicine on physicians employed by the state (EG SEE FISC NOTE OF EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 561 FINAL PASSAGE (#352) (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2021-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-11HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 23. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-03HouseReported with amendments (13-2).
2021-04-14HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on Commerce.
2021-04-14HouseDischarged from the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback