LA HB559 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides with respect to early childhood literacy (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides with respect to early childhood literacy (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 559 FINAL PASSAGE (#336) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-05-28SenateReported favorably.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-20HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-18HouseReported favorably (23-0).
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-05-07HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-28HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-28HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback