LA HB556 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-06 - Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title; recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates and provides for a program to provide state funding for the education of students not enrolled in public school (RR1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates and provides for a program to provide state funding for the education of students not enrolled in public school (RR1 INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 556 FINAL PASSAGE (#603) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 556 FINAL PASSAGE (#603) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-06SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title; recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2021-05-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-20HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021.
2021-05-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-17HouseReported with amendments (17-0).
2021-05-06HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-05-05HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB556&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211928
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221324
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225462
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226869
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220612
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220999
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221235
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221712
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225366
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225153
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225521
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226624
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231181
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231701
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1211936
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219692
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221458
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223555
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225497
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225732
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227038
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227072
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231743
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232077
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226836
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226940

Bill Comments 750

feedback