LA HB553 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Senate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Peterson, and White.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Senate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Peterson, and White.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the casino operating contract (REF +$25,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to the casino operating contract (REF +$25,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 553 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1315) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 553 FINAL PASSAGE (#1248) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 553 AMENDMENT # 4499 BY WHITE HB 553 BY MR. SPEAKER (#1247) (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 553 AMENDMENT # 4457 BY LAFLEUR HB 553 BY MR. SPEAKER (#1246) (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 553 FINAL PASSAGE (#186) (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 553 FINAL PASSAGE (#1248) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 553 AMENDMENT # 4499 BY WHITE HB 553 BY MR. SPEAKER (#1247) (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 553 AMENDMENT # 4457 BY LAFLEUR HB 553 BY MR. SPEAKER (#1246) (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 553 FINAL PASSAGE (#186) (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Peterson, and White. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Barras, Mack, and Abramson. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 16 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 12. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/18. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |