LA HB553 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a uniform fines and costs assessment form for criminal cases
Title
Provides for a uniform fines and costs assessment form for criminal cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 553, ADOPT (#1012) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 553, MOTION TO ADOPT (#930) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 553, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#583) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 553, FINAL PASSAGE (#448) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 553, FINAL PASSAGE (#52) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 553, MOTION TO ADOPT (#930) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 553, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#583) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 553, FINAL PASSAGE (#448) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 553, FINAL PASSAGE (#52) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-29 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 366. | |
2011-06-24 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference committee report received. | |
2011-06-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/23/2011. | |
2011-06-22 | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2011-06-21 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Peterson, and Claitor. | |
2011-06-20 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2011-06-20 | House conferees appointed: Foil, Rosalind Jones, and Lorusso. | |
2011-06-14 | Notice House rejected Senate amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-02 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-01 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-31 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-09 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2011-05-05 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-02 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/5/2011. | |
2011-05-02 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-04-28 | Reported with amendments (11-0-1) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |