LA HB547 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to collection of sales tax on remote sales (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to collection of sales tax on remote sales (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 547 FINAL PASSAGE (#771) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 547 HB 547 BY ABRAMSON (#771) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 547 FINAL PASSAGE (#491) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-17HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 360.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-29SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-28SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-27SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-13HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB547&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122226
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133658
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141176
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144281
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1132359
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133473
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122244
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133274
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133680
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136696
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143381
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136830
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140998
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141476

Bill Comments

feedback