LA HB543 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes ports to use the design-build method on certain construction projects
Title
Authorizes ports to use the design-build method on certain construction projects
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 543, FINAL PASSAGE (#261) (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2011-05-24 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2011. | |
2011-05-18 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably (13-0-1) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |