LA HB542 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to internet regulation by the Public Service Commission (OR NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to internet regulation by the Public Service Commission (OR NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Hollis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |