LA HB542 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for increased penalties for certain traffic-control signal violations
Title
Provides for increased penalties for certain traffic-control signal violations
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Cox [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 542 FINAL PASSAGE (#210) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2024-03-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-03-13 | House | Reported favorably (13-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |