LA HB541 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 39, nays 51. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 39, nays 51. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the subject matters considered during regular legislative sessions (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for the subject matters considered during regular legislative sessions (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 541 FINAL PASSAGE (#389) (Y: 39 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 39, nays 51. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Notice given. |
2018-03-28 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-03-28 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-03-28 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-03-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18. |
2018-03-21 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported without amendments (6-0). |
2018-03-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-03-14 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |