LA HB541 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to early graduation from high school including incentives for students and savings used for certain other educational purposes (RE +$5,664,314 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to early graduation from high school including incentives for students and savings used for certain other educational purposes (RE +$5,664,314 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 541 FINAL PASSAGE (#324) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported favorably (21-0). |
2017-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |