LA HB540 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for eligibility of charter boat fishing guides for the Fisherman's Gear Compensation Fund
Title
Provides for eligibility of charter boat fishing guides for the Fisherman's Gear Compensation Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 540 FINAL PASSAGE (#138) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 104, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |