LA HB54 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the crime of adoption deception (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the crime of adoption deception (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 54 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1219) (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#1035) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 54 2/3 vote (#1034) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 54 Consider after the 57th day (#1179) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#86) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 54 AMENDMENT # 1788 BY NEWELL MOTION TO ADOPT (#85) (Y: 26 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-29HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 464.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-10HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 70, nays 27, Senate amendments concurred in.
2021-06-09HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/10/2021.
2021-06-09HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-09HouseNotice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
2021-06-09SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-09SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2021-06-09SenateRead by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-09SenateNotice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
2021-06-09HouseBy a vote of 70 yeas, 28 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
2021-05-27SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2021-05-27SenateRules suspended.
2021-05-20SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-19SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-18SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-28SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2021-04-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-04-27HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 25. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
2021-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-22HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-05HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/5/2021.
2021-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB54&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1201830
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216755
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234432
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236375
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215984
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216531
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217987
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226612
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1201833
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212672
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216768
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216996
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231890
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233981
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236023
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1237500
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217998
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218007
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233946
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233967
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233973
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234397

Bill Comments

feedback