LA HB538 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 922.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 922.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the governing authority of the city of Mansfield to levy and collect a hotel occupancy tax subject to voter approval (EN +$38,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes the governing authority of the city of Mansfield to levy and collect a hotel occupancy tax subject to voter approval (EN +$38,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 538, FINAL PASSAGE (#1413) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 538, FINAL PASSAGE (#971) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 538, FINAL PASSAGE (#971) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 922. | |
2010-06-15 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-11 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-08 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-07 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-25 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | |
2010-05-24 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-24 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-05-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 24, 2010. | |
2010-05-17 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-05-13 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-06 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2010-04-05 | Read by title. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |