LA HB536 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lowers the minimum age for initial qualification for an M.J. Foster Promise Award from 21 to 18 (EG NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Lowers the minimum age for initial qualification for an M.J. Foster Promise Award from 21 to 18 (EG NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Kenny Cox [D] | Rep. Beryl Amedee [R] | Rep. Ken Brass [D] | Rep. Julie Emerson [R] |
Rep. Charles Owen [R] | Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-24 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2022. |
2022-05-23 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-23 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2022. |
2022-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-17 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-10 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |