LA HB530 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain taxpayers claiming the earned income tax credit to provide the Dept. of Revenue with certain information regarding residency of dependents (RE NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Title
Requires certain taxpayers claiming the earned income tax credit to provide the Dept. of Revenue with certain information regarding residency of dependents (RE NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 530 FINAL PASSAGE (#617) (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 530 FINAL PASSAGE (#562) (Y: 51 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 530 FINAL PASSAGE (#562) (Y: 51 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2019-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 27. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-28 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 50/28/19. |
2019-05-28 | House | Notice given. |
2019-05-28 | House | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-28 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 30. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending. |
2019-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19. |
2019-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-20 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |