LA HB529 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the compensation of a deputy parish custodian of voting machines (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the compensation of a deputy parish custodian of voting machines (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 529 FINAL PASSAGE (#1274) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 529 FINAL PASSAGE (#962) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-17HouseEffective date: 08/01/2016.
2016-06-17HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 626.
2016-06-06HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2016-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2016-06-05HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2016-06-03HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2016-06-03SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2016-06-02SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-06-02SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2016-06-01SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2016-06-01SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2016-05-24SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2016-05-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-05-23HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-05-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2016.
2016-05-17HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-05-16HouseReported favorably (17-0).
2016-03-17HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2016-03-16HouseReported favorably (9-0), with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations.
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2016-03-04HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
2016-03-03HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2016-03-03HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=16rs&b=HB529&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=982025
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=985606
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1009536
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1013213
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=982128
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=985385
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=985646
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1003517
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1011166
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1005694
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1009469

Bill Comments

feedback