LA HB529 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Lafourche Basin Levee District

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Lafourche Basin Levee District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 529 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#646) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 529 FINAL PASSAGE (#449) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 529 FINAL PASSAGE (#190) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-23HouseEffective date: August 1, 2015.
2015-06-23HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 220.
2015-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2015-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2015-06-02HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2015-06-01HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2015-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/01/2015.
2015-05-21HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2015-05-21SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2015-05-20SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2015-05-19SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2015-05-18SenateReported favorably.
2015-05-07SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2015-05-06SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2015-05-05HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015.
2015-04-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-04-28HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2015-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
2015-04-03HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
2015-04-03HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=15rs&b=HB529&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=936469
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=942491
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954071
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=960007
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=942194
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=950921
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=954008
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=936520
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=942688
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=950637
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=963123
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=945076
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=950671

Bill Comments

feedback