LA HB529 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) To impose a tax on single use plastic carry bags (OR INCREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) To impose a tax on single use plastic carry bags (OR INCREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2013-04-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
2013-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2013-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback